Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/17/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/17/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/23/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/23/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/23/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/23/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/23/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/24/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/24/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/24/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/24/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/24/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/24/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/24/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/24/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/24/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/24/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/24/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/24/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/28/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/29/2008