Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/10/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/10/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/10/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/09/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/09/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/09/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/09/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/09/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/09/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/09/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/09/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/09/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/09/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/10/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/10/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/10/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/10/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/10/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/10/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/10/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/10/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/10/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/10/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/10/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/10/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/10/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/11/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/11/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/11/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/11/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/11/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/17/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/17/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/17/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/17/2008