Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6]* 07/10/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/22/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/22/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 07/22/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/30/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/30/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/30/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/30/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/30/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/30/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/11/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/11/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/11/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/16/2008