Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/07/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/08/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/08/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/08/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/08/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/14/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/14/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2007