Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/17/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 07/17/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/22/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/22/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/22/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/29/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/30/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/30/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/15/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/17/2008