Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/22/2008
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/31/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/31/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/31/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/31/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/31/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/10/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/10/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/10/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/10/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/10/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/10/2008
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 09/15/2008
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/15/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/16/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/22/2008