Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/24/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/24/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/24/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/24/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/24/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/24/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/24/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/24/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/24/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/24/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/24/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/24/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/29/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/29/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/31/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/09/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/09/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/17/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/22/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/22/2008