Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/11/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/15/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/15/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/15/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/15/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/15/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/15/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/15/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/15/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/15/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/17/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/17/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/17/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/17/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/17/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/23/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/23/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/23/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/23/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/23/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/23/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/23/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/23/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/23/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/25/2008