Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/24/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/29/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/29/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/29/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/29/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/29/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/31/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/31/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/31/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/31/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/31/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/08/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/08/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/08/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/16/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/16/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/26/2008