Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/30/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 07/30/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/30/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/30/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/31/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 08/01/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 08/01/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/01/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/01/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 09/08/2008
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/08/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/08/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/15/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/16/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/16/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/16/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/16/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/16/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/18/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/18/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/22/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/22/2008