Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 08/01/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/18/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/22/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/26/2008