Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/22/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/26/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/26/2008