Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 09/11/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/15/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/15/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/15/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/15/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/16/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/16/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/16/2008
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/16/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/16/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/17/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/17/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/18/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/23/2008