Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/11/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/11/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/15/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/15/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/16/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/16/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/16/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/16/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/16/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/16/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/18/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/18/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/18/2008
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/23/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/23/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/23/2008
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/23/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/23/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/24/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/24/2008