Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/15/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/15/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/15/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/18/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/18/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/18/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/18/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/18/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/18/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/18/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/18/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/18/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/18/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/18/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/23/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/23/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/23/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/23/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/23/2008
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/23/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/23/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/23/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/23/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/23/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/23/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/23/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/23/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/23/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/23/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/23/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/24/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/24/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/24/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/24/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/24/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/24/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/24/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/24/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/24/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/24/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/24/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/24/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/24/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/24/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/24/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/26/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/26/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/26/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/26/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/27/2008