Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/17/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/18/2008
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/18/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/18/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/18/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/18/2008
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/18/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/18/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/18/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/18/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/18/2008
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/18/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/18/2008
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/18/2008
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/18/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/18/2008
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/18/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/18/2008
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/18/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/22/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/22/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/26/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/26/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/02/2008