Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/26/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/26/2008
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/26/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/26/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/26/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/26/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/26/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/26/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/26/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/28/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/29/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/02/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/02/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/02/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/02/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/20/2008