Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/08/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/08/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/08/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/14/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/14/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/14/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/14/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/14/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/05/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/05/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/05/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/06/2007