Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/15/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/27/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/16/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/16/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/16/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/16/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/16/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/05/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/27/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/01/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/15/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/24/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/12/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/30/2008
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/15/2008