Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 01/05/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/05/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 01/05/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/05/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/05/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/05/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/05/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/05/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/05/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/05/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/10/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/10/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/10/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/10/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/10/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/12/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/12/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 01/12/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/12/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/18/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/18/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/24/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/07/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/19/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/07/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/07/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/27/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/03/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/15/2008