Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/28/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/28/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/28/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/28/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/28/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/28/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/28/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/28/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/28/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/01/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/01/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/05/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/05/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/05/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/05/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/05/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/06/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/07/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/21/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/21/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/21/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/21/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/21/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/21/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/21/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/28/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/28/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/17/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/20/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/01/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/16/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/16/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/16/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/16/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/21/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/21/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/25/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/25/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/25/2007