There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that a "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day" should be established.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/25/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 0 (Roll no. 549).(text: CR H7022-7023)
02/16/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
06/25/2007-6:24pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/25/2007-6:24pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 0 (Roll no. 549). (text: CR H7022-7023)
06/25/2007-6:01pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7050-7051)
06/25/2007-3:15pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/25/2007-3:07pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 189.
06/25/2007-3:07pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7022-7024)
06/25/2007-3:07pmMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
06/12/2007Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
06/12/2007Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/16/2007Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
02/16/2007Introduced in House

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/21/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/21/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/21/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/26/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/26/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/26/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/03/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/08/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/06/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/06/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform02/16/2007 Referred to
06/12/2007 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.189. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (06/25/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that there should be established a "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day" to honor those members of the U.S. Armed Forces who served in Vietnam.