Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/27/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/27/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/14/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/14/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/14/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/14/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/14/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/14/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/14/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/14/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/16/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/18/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/18/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/23/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/23/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/23/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/25/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/25/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/30/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/30/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/01/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/01/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/02/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/08/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/08/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/08/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/09/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/14/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/24/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/06/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/07/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/07/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/07/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/07/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/07/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/18/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/20/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/26/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/07/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/15/2007