Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/06/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/12/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/14/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/22/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/24/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/25/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/25/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/25/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/25/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/25/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/25/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/25/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/25/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/25/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/25/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/26/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/26/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/27/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/28/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/10/2007