Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/07/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/07/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/25/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/25/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/25/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/25/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/01/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/01/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/01/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/01/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/03/2007