Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/09/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/09/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 03/09/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/12/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/13/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/15/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/21/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/26/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/18/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/25/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/25/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/01/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/02/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/02/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/02/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/02/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/02/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/02/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/02/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/02/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/08/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/15/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/15/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/15/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/05/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/05/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/05/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/11/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/12/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/13/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/13/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/13/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/18/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/25/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/23/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/27/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/03/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/03/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/03/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/03/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/03/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/03/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/03/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/03/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/03/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/03/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/03/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/04/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/04/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/04/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/04/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/04/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/09/2007