Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/09/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/12/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/12/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/12/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/14/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/14/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/19/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/22/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/22/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/23/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/23/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/15/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/15/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/21/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/22/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/22/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/23/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/24/2007