Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/09/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/09/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/09/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/10/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/10/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/11/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/12/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/16/2007