Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/02/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/02/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/09/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/09/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/09/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/09/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/09/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/09/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/09/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/09/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/09/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/09/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/14/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/21/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/21/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/07/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/19/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/26/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/26/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/11/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/11/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/11/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/11/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/30/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/12/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/22/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/07/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/27/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/05/2008