Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/15/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/26/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/26/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/26/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/26/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/26/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/26/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/20/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/20/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/20/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/20/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/20/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/20/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/20/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/20/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/20/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 04/20/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/20/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/26/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/01/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/01/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/01/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/01/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/01/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/01/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/01/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/01/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/01/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/01/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/01/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/01/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/01/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/01/2007