Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/26/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/28/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/28/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/28/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/28/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/28/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/28/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/28/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/28/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/28/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/28/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/28/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/28/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/28/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/28/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/29/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/29/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/29/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/29/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/16/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/25/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew