Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/29/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/21/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/21/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/21/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/21/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/21/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/21/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/24/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/20/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/20/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/20/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/20/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/20/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/20/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/20/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/20/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 06/20/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/20/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/20/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/20/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/20/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/20/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/20/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/20/2007