Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 04/17/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 04/17/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/23/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/23/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/23/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/23/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/23/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/25/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/25/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/25/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/25/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/25/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/25/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/25/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/02/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/02/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/02/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/02/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/07/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/05/2007