There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

A resolution denouncing the practices of female genital mutilation, domestic violence, "honor" killings, acid burnings, dowry deaths, and other gender-based persecutions, and expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that participation, protection, recognition, and equality of women is crucial to achieving a just, moral and peaceful society.

Official Title as Introduced

Denouncing the practices of female genital mutilation, domestic violence, "honor" killings, acid burning, dowry deaths, and other gender-based persecutions and expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that participation, protection, recognition, and independence of women is crucial to achieving a just, moral, and honorable society.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/09/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 0 (Roll no. 949).(text: CR H11353-11354)
01/05/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
10/09/2007-7:06pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/09/2007-7:06pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 0 (Roll no. 949). (text: CR H11353-11354)
10/09/2007-6:42pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H11353-11356, H11368)
10/09/2007-5:29pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/09/2007-5:18pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 32.
10/09/2007-5:18pmConsidered under suspension of the rules.
10/09/2007-5:17pmMs. Jackson-Lee moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/31/2007Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
07/31/2007Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/17/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on International Organizations, Human Rights, and Oversight.
01/05/2007Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/05/2007Introduced in House

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/22/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/22/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/22/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/22/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/22/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/23/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/27/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/27/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/27/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/27/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/30/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/30/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/20/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/05/2007 Referred to
07/31/2007 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Organizations, Human Rights, and Oversight04/17/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.32.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.32. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/09/2007)

Denounces and demands the cessation of the practices of female genital mutilation, domestic violence, honor killings, acid burning, dowry deaths, and other gender-based persecutions and crimes.

Asserts that women are not chattel, should not be trafficked, exploited, or sold for services, and should not be denied the right to education, to ownership of property, or to participate in full, economic, social and political life.

Demands the cessation of these barbaric practices and the dismantling of social and institutional mechanisms which perpetuate systematic discrimination against women and girls.

Calls on all governments to pass enforceable laws banning these practices, prosecute any individuals who persecute or violate women and girls with these acts, and pass measures to empower women and girls and afford them equal access to educational, social, and economic opportunities.

Calls on the President and fellow donor countries to promote the rights, health, empowerment of women in every aspect of their foreign assistance to developing countries, and discourage continued acts of violence against women and the impunity that often accompanies these acts.

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) participation, protection, recognition, health, and equality of women and girls are crucial to achieving a just, moral, and peaceful society; and (2) regardless of religion, geography, or form of government, women should not be denied equal rights, which should be defended and enforced when they are abridged, challenged, or violated.