Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/22/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/22/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/22/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/22/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/22/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/22/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/22/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/23/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/24/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/27/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/27/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/27/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/27/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/30/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/30/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/30/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/31/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/20/2007