Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/07/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/07/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/08/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/08/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/08/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/08/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/09/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/09/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/14/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/17/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/21/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/16/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/11/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/10/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/28/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/06/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/10/2008