Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/10/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/06/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/06/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/06/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/06/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/11/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/11/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/11/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/13/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/14/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/15/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/15/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/15/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/15/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/15/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/15/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/15/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/15/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/20/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/20/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/20/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/28/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/28/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/28/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/28/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/10/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/10/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/10/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/10/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/10/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/10/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/16/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/25/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/31/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/01/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 08/03/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/03/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/03/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 08/03/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/18/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/01/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/03/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/09/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/23/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/08/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/08/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/09/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/09/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/09/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/14/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/15/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/15/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/04/2007
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 12/12/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/12/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/14/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/14/2008
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/25/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/25/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/26/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/28/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/05/2008
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/10/2008
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/13/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/14/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/01/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/05/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/04/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew