Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/01/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/03/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/03/2007
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/03/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/03/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/03/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/03/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/03/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/03/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/03/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/03/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/03/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/03/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/03/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/10/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/10/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/10/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/10/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/10/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/21/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/24/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/24/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/24/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/24/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/24/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/24/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/24/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/24/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/24/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/24/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/24/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/24/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/24/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/24/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/24/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/24/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/07/2007