Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/17/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/17/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/17/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/17/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/22/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/22/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/22/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/22/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/22/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/22/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/22/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/22/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/22/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/31/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/31/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/05/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/08/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/13/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/15/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/27/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/05/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/09/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/22/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/26/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/24/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/24/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/24/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/17/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/28/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 08/02/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/02/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/04/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/04/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/13/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/13/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/17/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/12/2008