Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/07/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/14/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/14/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/14/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/22/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/22/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/07/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/07/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/07/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/07/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/07/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/14/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/14/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/14/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/14/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/14/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/18/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/18/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/18/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/18/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/18/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/27/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/12/2007