Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/07/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/12/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/12/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/12/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/12/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/12/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/12/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/12/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/12/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 06/12/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/12/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/15/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/15/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/15/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/15/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/15/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/15/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/15/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/15/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/23/2007