Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 05/17/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/17/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/13/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/14/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/25/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/01/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/10/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/12/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/15/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/06/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/29/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/08/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/08/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/12/2008
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/12/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/03/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/17/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 06/19/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/15/2008
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/15/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/15/2008