Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/21/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/21/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/22/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/22/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/22/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/22/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/22/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/22/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/22/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/22/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/22/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/22/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/22/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/22/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/22/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/22/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/22/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/22/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/22/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/22/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/22/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/22/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/22/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/22/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/22/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/22/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/22/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/22/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/22/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/22/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/22/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/22/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/23/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/23/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/23/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/23/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/23/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/05/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/13/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/12/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/16/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/27/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 08/03/2007

Show cosponsors who withdrew