Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/22/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/22/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/22/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/24/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/24/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/05/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/20/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/20/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/22/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/25/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/25/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/26/2007