Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/12/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/12/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/16/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/16/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/16/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/16/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/18/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/18/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/18/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/18/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/18/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/18/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/18/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/18/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/18/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/18/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/18/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/18/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/18/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/19/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/19/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/19/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/19/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/19/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/19/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/23/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/23/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/27/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/27/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 08/01/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 08/01/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/05/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/07/2007