Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/05/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/05/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/05/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/15/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/20/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/27/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/27/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/11/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/04/2007