Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/25/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/26/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/26/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/28/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/28/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/10/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/10/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/11/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/18/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/22/2008