There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that there should be established a National Letter Carriers Appreciation Day.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/29/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2826)
01/10/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
04/29/2008-4:12pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/29/2008-4:12pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2826)
04/29/2008-4:06pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 49.
04/29/2008-4:06pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2825-2827)
04/29/2008-4:05pmMr. Kucinich moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
04/16/2008Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by Voice Vote.
04/16/2008Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
01/10/2007Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/10/2007Introduced in House

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/01/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/01/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/06/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/06/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/14/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/14/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/17/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/11/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 01/17/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/23/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/23/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/06/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/13/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/27/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/27/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/05/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/06/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/14/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/09/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/09/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/10/2007 Referred to
04/16/2008 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.49.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.49. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (04/29/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Supports the goals and ideals of a National Letter Carriers Appreciation Day to recognize the unique contributions made by the United States Postal Service letter carriers to the nation's well-being and prosperity.