Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/01/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/01/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/06/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/06/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/07/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/14/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/14/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/17/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 05/03/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/12/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/11/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 01/17/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/23/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 01/23/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/23/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/23/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/06/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/06/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/13/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/27/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/27/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/05/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/06/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/14/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/31/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/31/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/09/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/09/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2008