Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/19/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/25/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/25/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/25/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/25/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/25/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/25/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/25/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/25/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/25/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/25/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/25/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/25/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/25/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/25/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/25/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/25/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/25/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/25/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/25/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/25/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/25/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/25/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/25/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/28/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/28/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/28/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/28/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/28/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/28/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/28/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/16/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/16/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/16/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/23/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/23/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/23/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/23/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/23/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/23/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/23/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/23/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/02/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 08/02/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 08/02/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 08/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/02/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 08/02/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 08/02/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 08/02/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/02/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/10/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/24/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/15/2008